NV AB376A | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Note: Carry Over of previous AB376
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; revising provisions governing the filing of a complaint after an arrest without a warrant; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to criminal procedure. (BDR 14-1075)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | Bill read with Governor's veto message. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Made Special Order of Business for Wednesday, February 6, 2019, at 11:45 a.m. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Returned from Secretary of State. |
Same As/Similar To
AB376 (Carry Over) 2017-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6062/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB376_79.pdf |