NV AB376 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to criminal procedure. (BDR 14-1075)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to criminal procedure. (BDR 14-1075)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03AssemblySenate Amendment No. 874 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-05-23SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-05-23SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 874.) To printer.
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-04-24AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-21AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 410.) To printer.
2017-04-20AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback