NV AB368 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to improvement districts; revising the projects authorized to be financed within a tourism improvement district; eliminating the authority to create a tourism improvement district in certain smaller counties; revising the reporting requirements for the Department of Taxation related to tourism improvement districts; eliminating the authority to pledge certain proceeds to finance certain projects for the promotion of economic development and tourism in a local improvement district; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to improvement districts. (BDR 22-17)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-06-01AssemblyTo enrollment.
2021-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2021-05-31AssemblyTo printer.
2021-05-31AssemblyConference report adopted by Senate.
2021-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 615 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
2021-05-30AssemblyConference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
2021-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-29SenateSenate Amendment No. 615 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-27AssemblySenate Amendment No. 615 not concurred in. To Senate.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-20SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 615.) To printer.
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2021-04-22SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyTo Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-20AssemblyTo printer.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
2021-04-19AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 258.)
2021-04-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7944/Overview
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB368.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB368_R1.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB368_R2.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB368_R3.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB368_EN.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_AB368_258.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_AB368_R1_615.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/CA_AB368_R2_CA2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7312&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7836&voteResultPanel=All

Bill Comments

feedback