NV AB367 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 318.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 318.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to persons with addictive disorders; establishing the preferred manner of referring to such persons in Nevada Revised Statutes and the Nevada Administrative Code; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing persons affected by addictive disorders. (BDR 17-690)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 318. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |