NV AB366 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 479.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 479.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates four behavioral health regions in this State and a regional behavioral health policy board for each region. (BDR 39-987)
Title
Creates four behavioral health regions in this State and a regional behavioral health policy board for each region. (BDR 39-987)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 479. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 194.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |