NV AB364 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to manufactured homes; authorizing the issuance of a certificate of ownership for a manufactured home, mobile home or commercial coach under certain circumstances; providing for the automatic transfer of certain manufactured homes, mobile homes and commercial coaches to designated beneficiaries upon the death of the owner; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the transfer, title and sale of manufactured homes. (BDR 43-801)

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 381.
2019-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-30SenateRead second time.
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 606.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback