NV AB363 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing manufactured housing. (BDR 43-996)
Title
Revises provisions governing manufactured housing. (BDR 43-996)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-05-07 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee. | |
2011-05-07 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-27 | To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 282.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |