NV AB355 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to employment; requiring certain grocery employers to hire and retain certain grocery workers for a certain period of time upon a change in control of such grocery stores; requiring certain grocery stores to post public notice of a change in control of the grocery store; requiring certain grocery stores to provide written notice of a change in control of the grocery store to certain grocery workers; providing that certain groups are exempt from the provisions of this act in certain situations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishing provisions governing the retention of certain workers. (BDR 52-967)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 590.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |