NV AB353 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 356.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 356.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to recycling; revising certain provisions governing recyclable material; requiring certain governmental entities to recycle certain additional products and waste; providing certain exemptions from such a requirement; revising the required contents of a report made to the Legislature on the status of recycling programs; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the disposition of certain types of materials and waste produced by certain governmental entities. (BDR 40-623)
Sponsors
Rep. Heidi Swank [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 356. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 674 and 861 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 861.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 674.) To printer. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Health and Human Services. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 531.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |