NV AB350 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to higher education; creating the Administrative Services Office within the Nevada System of Higher Education; replacing the position of Chancellor of the System with the Director of the Office; requiring the Board of Regents to establish an advisory board at each state college and community college to provide certain feedback concerning matters relating to the state college or community college; establishing the Articulation and Transfer Board to perform certain duties relating to the transition of pupils to educational institutions within the System; clarifying the composition of the System; revising provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of certain officers within the System; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to higher education. (BDR 34-1054)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6649/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB350.pdf |