NV AB349 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; revising provisions that govern an owner of an Old Timer vehicle, classic rod or classic car, including providing that such vehicles are exempt from the provisions governing the control of emissions from engines as long as they are not used for general transportation and further providing that such vehicles which are used for general transportation shall not be issued special license plates, except in certain situations, and instead must comply with the provisions governing the control of emissions from engines; authorizing the Department of Motor Vehicles to impose by regulation a fee of not more than $2 for the issuance and renewal of a license to inspect motor vehicles and devices for the control of pollution for certain additional locations; exempting a new motor vehicle from emissions testing for the first 3 years of the life of the motor vehicle and then requiring that emissions testing be conducted on new motor vehicles annually after the fourth registration of the motor vehicle; requiring certain fees charged for certain electronic monitoring programs to be equal in amount to the fee charged for forms certifying emission control compliance; authorizing certain boards of county commissioners to impose an additional fee for certain actions; requiring the Department to collect the additional fee on behalf of the county and distribute to the county any money obtained as a result of the additional fee; requiring any money received from such an additional fee to be used by the county to support certain programs that seek to reduce emissions from a motor vehicle; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing motor vehicles. (BDR 43-58)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 861 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 861.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To printer. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 690.) |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 375.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |