NV AB342 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; revising provisions governing the eligibility of a pupil who transfers schools pursuant to the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children to participate and practice in a sanctioned sport or other interscholastic event; revising provisions relating to the administration and implementation of the Compact; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing pupils who are children of military personnel. (BDR 34-624)
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Edwards [R] | Sen. Scott Hammond [R] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Rep. Al Kramer [R] |
Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] | Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 56. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 180.) To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |