NV AB339 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing compensation for overtime. (BDR 53-968)
Title
Revises provisions governing compensation for overtime. (BDR 53-968)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-06-02 | Assembly | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee. |
2013-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment No. 653 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 653 not concurred in. To Senate. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 653.) To printer. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 479.) To printer. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |