NV AB333 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 103.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 103.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to special license plates; providing for the issuance of Vegas Strong special license plates; imposing a fee for the issuance and renewal of such license plates; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the issuance of Vegas Strong specialty license plates. (BDR 43-273)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Chapter 103. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 352.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |