NV AB330 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Chapter 150. (Effective May 31, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Chapter 150. (Effective May 31, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring a suspension or expulsion in a charter school or a university school for profoundly gifted pupils to be consistent with such punishments in certain public schools; requiring a plan for restorative discipline for public schools to include consideration of certain data relating to pupil discipline; authorizing the Superintendent of Public Instruction to require implementation of an alternative plan for restorative discipline if a public school fails to take certain actions relating to disproportionality in pupil discipline; requiring a plan for restorative discipline to reflect the authority to temporarily remove a pupil from the classroom; requiring certain actions by a school at the time of a suspension or expulsion of a pupil for committing certain acts; revising the persons to whom the appeals of certain disciplinary determinations may be made; revising requirements for policies for the appeal of suspensions and expulsions; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-1087)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Chapter 150. (Effective May 31, 2023) |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 851 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 851.) |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Without recommendation. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: May 19, 2023. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 377.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |