NV AB328 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 424.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 424.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to professional licensing boards. (BDR 54-157)
Title
Revises provisions relating to professional licensing boards. (BDR 54-157)
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Pickard [R] | Rep. Irene Bustamante Adams [D] | Rep. Shannon Bilbray-Axelrod [D] | Rep. Christopher Edwards [R] |
Rep. Al Kramer [R] | Rep. Jim Marchant [R] | Rep. Michael Sprinkle [D] | Sen. Robin Titus [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 424. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 1099 and 1104 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 1099 and 1104.) To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 620.) To printer. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 536.) To printer. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |