NV AB327 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 157.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 157.
Summary
Requires the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to submit a biennial report concerning the participation of certain protected classes in the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-1063)
Title
Requires the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to submit a biennial report concerning the participation of certain protected classes in the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-1063)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 157. | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-09 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-16 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=650 |