NV AB325 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Read second time.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to records; authorizing the submission of a certified paper copy of an electronic document to certain county recorders; prescribing a certificate sufficient for certifying that a paper copy is a true and correct copy of an electronic document; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the recording of documents. (BDR 20-642)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateRead second time.
2021-05-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-04-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2021-04-16SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-14AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 297.) To printer.
2021-04-13AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2021-04-13AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2021-04-13AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback