NV AB325 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Task Force on the Modernization of State Government. (BDR 19-953)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Task Force on the Modernization of State Government. (BDR 19-953)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-04-17AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
2017-04-17AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-04-17AssemblyRead second time.
2017-04-17AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback