NV AB325 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 409.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts and revises provisions relating to guardians. (BDR 54-976)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts and revises provisions relating to guardians. (BDR 54-976)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-08AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 409.
2015-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-31AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment No. 843 concurred in.
2015-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-05-22SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-22SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 843.) To printer.
2015-05-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-23SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 638.) To printer.
2015-04-20AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 373.)
2015-04-20AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-06AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-03-18AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback