NV AB325 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a court to commit certain convicted persons to the custody of the Department of Corrections for an evaluation. (BDR 14-742)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a court to commit certain convicted persons to the custody of the Department of Corrections for an evaluation. (BDR 14-742)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2013-06-03SenateRead third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.)
2013-06-03SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2013-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-06-02SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2013-06-02SenateIn Senate.
2013-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2013-06-02AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2013-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2013-04-18AssemblyTo committee.
2013-04-18AssemblyExemption effective.
2013-04-18AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 311.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-04-01AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2013-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2013-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback