NV AB32 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 250. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 250. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal justice; providing that information collected or stored by the Department of Sentencing Policy for the purpose of analyzing and understanding the criminal justice system is confidential; revising the qualifications of the Executive Director of the Department; revising provisions concerning the membership of the Nevada Sentencing Commission; requiring that certain data tracked and assessed by the Commission include the housing status of persons admitted to and released from prison; authorizing the Nevada Local Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council to accept any gift, donation, bequest, grant or other source of money for the purpose of carrying out its duties; revising provisions relating to risk and needs assessments administered to certain probationers and parolees; authorizing the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety to impose confinement in a jail or detention facility or place a person under a system of active electronic monitoring for technical violations of the conditions of probation or parole; requiring the system of graduated sanctions adopted by the Division to include guidance on the use of such confinement and electronic monitoring; revising the definition of technical violation as the term relates to violations of the conditions of probation or parole; revising provisions relating to the temporary and full revocation of probation, suspension of sentence or parole supervision for technical violations of the conditions of probation or parole; requiring the Department of Sentencing Policy to collect and analyze certain data and submit a report to the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to criminal justice. (BDR 14-263)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 250. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 765 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To printer. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 765.) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 57.) To printer. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |