NV AB32 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to workforce development; authorizing certain nonprofit entities to participate in certain programs of workforce recruitment, assessment and training; authorizing the training of existing employees of an employer as part of certain programs of workforce recruitment, assessment and training; revising provisions governing the application process for a provider of such a program or a business that wishes to participate in such a program; revising provisions governing certain funding which is available to defray the cost of such a program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing workforce development. (BDR 18-329)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 313.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |