NV AB316 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public safety; enacting the Nevada 24/7 Sobriety and Drug Monitoring Program Act; establishing a voluntary statewide sobriety and drug monitoring program; requiring any political subdivision that elects to participate in the program to adopt guidelines relating to the program; requiring such guidelines to establish certain fees; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to driving under the influence of alcohol or a prohibited substance. (BDR 43-312)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 683.) To printer.
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 353.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback