NV AB316 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the taxation of certain deliveries and transfers of firearms. (BDR 32-918)
Title
Revises provisions governing the taxation of certain deliveries and transfers of firearms. (BDR 32-918)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | To committee. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | To printer. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 360.) |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |