NV AB304 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Chapter 481.
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Chapter 481.
Summary
Makes various changes relating to the preservation and improvement of existing neighborhoods. (BDR 22-641)
Title
Makes various changes relating to the preservation and improvement of existing neighborhoods. (BDR 22-641)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Chapter 481. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | |
2009-06-01 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | To Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) | |
2009-06-01 | Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 1, 2009, at 9:00 p.m. | |
2009-05-31 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) | |
2009-05-30 | Returned to Assembly. | |
2009-05-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Amendment No. 907 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | To printer. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) | |
2009-05-22 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-22 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2009-05-22 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 907.) | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 228.) To printer. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-13 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-12 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=599 |