NV AB303 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Note: Carry Foward to future AB303A
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that core correctional services be provided only by the State or a local government with certain exceptions. (BDR 16-1103)
Title
Requires that core correctional services be provided only by the State or a local government with certain exceptions. (BDR 16-1103)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 341.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer. |
Same As/Similar To
AB303 (Carry Over) 2017-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor.