NV AB303 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the subsidy for coverage of certain retired persons under the Public Employees' Benefits Program. (BDR 23-681)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the subsidy for coverage of certain retired persons under the Public Employees' Benefits Program. (BDR 23-681)
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Aizley [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 303. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 180.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |