NV AB302 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers the Division of Parole and Probation from the Department of Public Safety to the Department of Corrections. (BDR 16-596)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers the Division of Parole and Probation from the Department of Public Safety to the Department of Corrections. (BDR 16-596)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 340.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-21AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-16AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-15AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback