NV AB3 | 2020 | 31st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - Chapter 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state financial administration; reducing certain appropriations and other money budgeted for Fiscal Year 2020-2021; authorizing certain sums appropriated to the Department of Health and Human Services to be transferred among the various budget accounts of the Department under certain circumstances; requiring the transfer of certain money to the State General Fund; revising various provisions relating to the authority for such transfers; authorizing certain expenditures; temporarily suspending the transfer from the State General Fund to the Account to Stabilize the Operation of the State Government for Fiscal Year 2020-2021; temporarily increasing the limitation on the amount of annual leave that certain state employees are authorized to carry forward to the next calendar year; providing for a 1-month suspension during Fiscal Year 2020-2021 of the payment of subsidies by the State to the Public Employees' Benefits Program for group insurance for certain active and retired public officers and employees; requiring state employees to take a certain number of hours of unpaid furlough leave during a certain period of Fiscal Year 2020-2021; providing exceptions and requirements relating to the furlough leave; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to state financial administration. (BDR S-8)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-20AssemblyChapter 5.
2020-07-20AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2020-07-19AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2020-07-19SenateTo Assembly.
2020-07-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2020-07-19SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-07-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-07-19SenateTo committee.
2020-07-19SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole.
2020-07-19SenateIn Senate.
2020-07-19AssemblyTo Senate.
2020-07-19AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2020-07-19AssemblyTo printer.
2020-07-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.)
2020-07-19AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 7.) Dispensed with reprinting.
2020-07-19AssemblyAction of passage rescinded.
2020-07-18AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2020-07-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To printer.
2020-07-18AssemblyFrom committee: Considered.
2020-07-18AssemblyRereferred to Committee of the Whole. To committee.
2020-07-18AssemblyTaken from General File.
2020-07-18AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2020-07-18AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 4.)
2020-07-16AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2020-07-15AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2020-07-15AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Considered.
2020-07-10AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2020-07-09AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback