NV AB298 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to water. (BDR 48-735)
Title
Revises provisions relating to water. (BDR 48-735)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 359.) To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |