NV AB298 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the City of Las Vegas to encourage the creation of small businesses. (BDR S-131)
Title
Makes an appropriation to the City of Las Vegas to encourage the creation of small businesses. (BDR S-131)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-04-05 | Assembly | Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt. |
2013-03-25 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/history.cfm?ID=671 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/AB/AB298.pdf |