NV AB296 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 357.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to actions concerning persons; establishing a civil cause of action to recover damages, reasonable attorney's fees and costs from a person who disseminates personal identifying information or sensitive information under certain circumstances; authorizing a court to issue a temporary restraining order or a permanent or temporary injunction under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a civil cause of action for the dissemination of personal identifying information or sensitive information under certain circumstances. (BDR 3-121)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 357.
2021-05-29AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-27AssemblySenate Amendment No. 660 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-20SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 660.) To printer.
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2021-04-22SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyTo Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To printer.
2021-04-19AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 320.)
2021-04-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-17AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback