NV AB294 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to suicide prevention for veterans. (BDR 37-692)
Title
Enacts provisions relating to suicide prevention for veterans. (BDR 37-692)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 567.) To printer. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 292.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |