NV AB292 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to bullying and cyber-bullying in public schools. (BDR 34-916)
Title
Revises provisions relating to bullying and cyber-bullying in public schools. (BDR 34-916)
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Rep. Ozzie Fumo [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Rep. Amber Joiner [D] |
Rep. Heidi Swank [D] | Sen. Mark Manendo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 278. |
2017-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 850 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 850.) To printer. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 476.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |