NV AB292 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 141.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 141.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing judicial proceedings for eminent domain. (BDR 3-803)
Title
Revises provisions governing judicial proceedings for eminent domain. (BDR 3-803)
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Daly [D] | Rep. Lucy Flores [D] | Rep. Jason Frierson [D] | Rep. William Horne [D] |
Sen. Marilyn Dondero Loop [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Richard Segerblom [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 141. | |
2011-05-27 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-25 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-22 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-19 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 283.) To printer. | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |