NV AB291 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 622.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public safety; establishing provisions governing certain orders for protection against high-risk behavior; defining certain terms relating to the issuance of such orders; prescribing certain conduct and acts that constitute high-risk behavior; authorizing certain persons to apply for ex parte and extended orders for protection against high-risk behavior under certain circumstances; providing for the issuance and enforcement of such orders; prohibiting a person against whom such an order is issued from possessing or having under his or her custody or control, or purchasing or otherwise acquiring, any firearm during the period in which the order is in effect; establishing certain other procedures relating to such orders; prohibiting the filing of an application for such orders under certain circumstances; making it a crime to violate such orders; prohibiting certain acts relating to the modification of a semiautomatic firearm; reducing the concentration of alcohol that may be present in the blood or breath of a person while in possession of a firearm; making it a crime to negligently store or leave a firearm under certain circumstances; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to public safety. (BDR 3-759)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17AssemblyChapter 622.
2019-06-14AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-01AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1027 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-30SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1027.) To printer.
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-20SenateWaiver granted effective: May 17, 2019.
2019-05-18Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 386.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback