NV AB287 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to health care; revising certain terminology relating to pregnancy and birth; providing for the licensing and regulation of freestanding birthing centers; requiring a freestanding birthing center to perform certain screening, report certain information to the local health officer and make certain information available to the Chief Medical Officer; authorizing the Maternal Mortality Review Committee to access certain information; eliminating the licensing and regulation of obstetric centers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to childbirth. (BDR 40-799)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14AssemblyChapter 517.
2021-06-08AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2021-05-27AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-25AssemblySenate Amendment Nos. 587 and 729 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly.
2021-05-21SenateTo printer.
2021-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
2021-05-21SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2021-05-21SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 729.)
2021-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-20SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 587.) To printer.
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2021-04-22SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyTo Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To printer.
2021-04-19AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 209.)
2021-04-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-17AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2021-03-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-03-16AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-15AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7779/Overview
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB287.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB287_R1.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB287_R2.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB287_R3.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB287_EN.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_AB287_209.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_AB287_R1_587.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_AB287_R2_729.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7291&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7741&voteResultPanel=All

Bill Comments 750

feedback