NV AB281 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; restricting certain state and local law enforcement agencies from performing certain actions relating to immigration enforcement; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts certain state and local law enforcement agencies from performing certain actions relating to immigration enforcement. (BDR 14-898)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-16AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-04-16AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback