NV AB278 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing class-size reduction. (BDR 34-749)
Title
Revises provisions governing class-size reduction. (BDR 34-749)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 499. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 322.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |