NV AB277 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 140.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing dental hygienists. (BDR 54-788)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing dental hygienists. (BDR 54-788)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-24AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 140.
2013-05-24AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2013-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2013-05-18SenateRead second time.
2013-05-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-04-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2013-04-16SenateIn Senate.
2013-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2013-04-15AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 143.) To printer.
2013-04-10AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2013-04-10AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2013-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-03-18AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2013-03-15AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback