NV AB274 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 296.
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 296.
Summary
Makes various changes regarding retail installment sales. (BDR 8-819)
Title
Makes various changes regarding retail installment sales. (BDR 8-819)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 296. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendment No. 596 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 596.) To printer. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-05 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-04 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-02 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-01 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-30 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-15 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-14 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-13 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-11 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=539 |