NV AB272 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to law enforcement; requiring law enforcement agencies in certain counties to participate in the National Integrated Ballistic Information Network of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives of the United States Department of Justice; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires law enforcement agencies in certain counties to participate in the National Integrated Ballistic Information Network. (BDR 15-603)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 176.
2019-05-24AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 304.) To printer.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-15AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback