NV AB272 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-851)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-851)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-05-29AssemblyBill read. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-28AssemblyReturned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.
2017-05-28AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-05-23AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-22AssemblySenate Amendment No. 773 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-05-19SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2017-05-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 773.) To printer.
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 556.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 518.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-09AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-08AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback