NV AB271 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 490.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 490.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to employment; requiring an employer who operates a call center to provide certain notice to the Labor Commissioner and affected employees before relocating the call center to a foreign country; providing that such an employer is ineligible to receive incentives for economic development from a state agency for a certain period of time with certain exceptions; authorizing the Labor Commissioner to impose certain penalties upon such employers for the failure to provide the required notice; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to call centers. (BDR 53-900)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Chapter 490. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 1086 and 1103 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1103.) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1086.) To printer. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 972.) To printer. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 501.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |