NV AB270 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to providers of health care; providing for the licensure and regulation of anesthesiologist assistants by the Board of Medical Examiners and the State Board of Osteopathic Medicine; requiring an anesthesiologist assistant to work under the supervision of a supervising anesthesiologist or supervising osteopathic anesthesiologist, as applicable, except when rendering emergency care under certain circumstances; establishing the maximum fee the Boards may impose for the licensure of an anesthesiologist assistant and the biennial registration of such licenses; exempting an anesthesiologist assistant from civil liability under certain circumstances; requiring an anesthesiologist assistant to report instances of neglect or abuse of older persons and vulnerable persons; authorizing an anesthesiologist assistant to be simultaneously licensed by the Board of Medical Examiners and the State Board of Osteopathic Medicine; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the licensure and regulation of anesthesiologist assistants. (BDR 54-714)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 247. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Taken from General File for next legislative day. Placed on General File. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 295.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |