NV AB266 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a deduction from certain taxes for certain wages paid by an employer under a qualifying paid family medical leave policy. (BDR 32-709)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a deduction from certain taxes for certain wages paid by an employer under a qualifying paid family medical leave policy. (BDR 32-709)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 580.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-12AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-08AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-07AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback