NV AB263 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the custody and support of children. (BDR 11-199)
Title
Revises provisions governing the custody and support of children. (BDR 11-199)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 445. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 745 and 958 concurred in. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 958.) To printer. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | To printer. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 745.) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 534.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |