NV AB262 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to children; revising provisions relating to the custody of children; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the custody of children. (BDR 11-131)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 977.) To printer. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |