NV AB261 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 204.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 204.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the board of trustees of a school district or the governing body of a charter school to ensure that instruction is provided to certain pupils on the history and contributions of certain groups of persons; revising provisions relating to the selection of instructional materials by the State Board of Education; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing education to provide diversity and inclusivity in the academic standards and curriculum. (BDR 34-672)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 204. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 252.) To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |